Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Barry, Christine Allison - Lead Attorney, against Hinz, Catherine, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
|
Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #6
Date: July 12, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #5
Date: May 24, 2022Summons Index #4
Date: May 24, 2022Judgment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #7
Date: July 12, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #2
Date: May 23, 2022Statement of Claim Index #1
Date: May 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #9 | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index # 9 | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #6 | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Attorney BARRY, CHRISTINE ALLISON; Defendant Hinz, Catherine Index #8 | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #7 | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 7 (Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D )
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 8 | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment Index # 6 (Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D )
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D)
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.