Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Court Trial filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Court, Judge Tax presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCourt, Judge Tax Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2004 |
CategoryTax Court |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Physical Case File Destroyed Per Retention Schedule
Judge: Court, Judge Tax |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Other Document
Judge: Court, Judge Tax |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Briefs
Judge: Court, Judge Tax |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Affidavit-Other
Judge: Court, Judge Tax |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Court, Judge Tax |
|
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order
Judge: Court, Judge Tax |
|
July 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Tax Court Order
Judge: Court, Judge Tax |
|
July 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Other Document
Judge: Court, Judge Tax |
|
April 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment and Notice of Judgment
Judge: Court, Judge Tax |
|
April 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judicial Officer: Court, Judge Tax)
Judge: Court, Judge Tax |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.