Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Aom-Affidavit Of Mailing filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Walker, Robert D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWalker, Robert D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 03, 2003 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Accounting
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order (Judicial Officer: Walker, Robert D. )
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Allowing Annual Account (Judicial Officer: Walker, Robert D. )
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Annual or Periodic Accounting
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
September 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Trustee's Annual Account
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Annual or Periodic Accounting
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
September 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Annual or Periodic Accounting
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
August 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Reminder Notice (Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding )
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.