Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Aom-Affidavit Of Mailing filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Walker, Robert D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWalker, Robert D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2004 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order (Judicial Officer: Walker, Robert D. )
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order-Other (Judicial Officer: Walker, Robert D. )
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order-Other
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Petition-Other | |
May 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Converted Pending Activity (Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding )
Judge: Judge, Presiding |
|
May 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Converted Pending Activity
Judge: Judge, Presiding |
|
June 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
DOC-Document Filed (Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding )
Judge: Judge, Presiding |
|
June 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
DOC-Document Filed
Judge: Judge, Presiding |
|
June 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
CLO-Closed (Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding )
Judge: Judge, Presiding |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.