Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Guardianship-Person filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Mcleod County, MN, . Mcleod County, MN Superior Courts with Savre, Michael R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMcleod County, MN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeSubject To Guardianship/Conservatorship Deceased |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: August 30, 2013Order Appointing Attorney
Date: February 20, 2013Notice of Filing of Order
Date: March 12, 2013Notice of Hearing
Date: January 24, 2013Order Granting Guardianship
Date: February 28, 2013Order-Other
Date: August 30, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order-Other (Judicial Officer: Savre,Michael R. , )
Judge: Savre,Michael R. , |
|
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition for Discharge | |
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Death Certificate | |
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order-Other
Judge: Savre, Michael R. |
|
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Subject to Guardianship/Conservatorship Deceased | |
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Other Document | |
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Guardianship (Judicial Officer: Wentzell, Michael D. )
Judge: Wentzell, Michael D. |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Letters of Guardianship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.