Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ene Status Conference filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Mcleod County, MN, . Mcleod County, MN Superior Courts with Winters, Jody L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMcleod County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDissolution Granted - Judgment |
Summary Real Estate Disposition Judgment
Date: June 24, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: June 24, 2021Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: June 17, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: January 25, 2021Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: June 17, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Initial Case Management Conference
Date: December 22, 2020Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: December 22, 2020Order-Other
Date: December 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summary Real Estate Disposition Judgment
Judge: Winters, Jody L. |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index # 25 | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summary Real Estate Disposition Judgment Index # 23 (Judicial Officer: Winters, Jody L. )
Judge: Winters, Jody L. |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 24 | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy Request | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 22 | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Judge: Winters, Jody L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.