Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Torrens case in the jurisdiction of Mcleod County, MN, . Mcleod County, MN Superior Courts with Savre, Michael R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2012 |
CategoryTorrens |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMcleod County, MN |
|
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: March 27, 2013Order to Show Cause
Date: January 29, 2013Order-Other
Date: March 26, 2013Notice of Case Filing
Date: January 08, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order-Other
Judge: Savre, Michael R. |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit-Other | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Savre, Michael R. |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Filing | |
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition-Other | |
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Report-Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.