Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hearing filed a(n) Civil Other/Misc. case in the jurisdiction of Mcleod County, MN, . Mcleod County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2012 |
CategoryCivil Other/Misc. |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMcleod County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order-Other (Judicial Officer: Conkel, Terrence E. )
Judge: Conkel, Terrence E. |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Mortgage Redemption Period Reduced | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit-Other | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Certify Unserved Process | |
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint-Civil | |
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Representation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.