Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Servicemaster Of St. Cloud, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Kube, Adam J, Kube, Krystal M, in the jurisdiction of Mcleod County, MN, . Mcleod County, MN Superior Courts with Looby, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLooby, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2019 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMcleod County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: February 19, 2020Transcript of Judgment Issued
Date: June 02, 2020Order for Judgment
Date: February 18, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: December 13, 2019Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: December 09, 2019Proof of Service
Date: January 13, 2020Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Looby, Timothy J. Index #4
Date: February 18, 2020Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #6
Date: June 02, 2020Proof of Service Filed By: Defendant Kube, Adam J; Defendant Kube, Krystal M Index #3
Date: January 13, 2020Statement of Claim and Summons Filed By: Plaintiff ServiceMaster of St. Cloud Index #1
Date: December 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued | |
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #6 | |
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index # 6 | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Defendant Kube, Adam J; Defendant Kube, Krystal M; Plaintiff ServiceMaster of St. Cloud Index #5 | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 5 | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment
Judge: Looby, Timothy J. |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Looby, Timothy J. Index #4 | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment Index # 4 (Judicial Officer: Looby, Timothy J. )
Judge: Looby, Timothy J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.