Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Southwest Health And Human Services, filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill case against Moe, Jeremiah Charles, in the jurisdiction of Lyon County, MN, . Lyon County, MN Superior Courts with Dietrich, Michelle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2022 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLyon County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeCommitted - Mentally Ill |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #72 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Proceeding and Discharging Patient Judicial Officer: Dietrich, Michelle A. Filed By: Respondent MOE, JEREMIAH CHARLES Index #71 | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | 6-Month Report Index #70 | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Respondent MOE, JEREMIAH CHARLES Index #68 | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Respondent MOE, JEREMIAH CHARLES; Attorney NAVARRETTE, CARLOTTA MARIA; Attorney OLDENKAMP, ERIC ALAN; Petitioner Southwest Health and Human Services Index #67 | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Continued Commitment Index #66 | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index #69 | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Index #65 | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Distributed Filed By: Attorney NAVARRETTE, CARLOTTA MARIA; Attorney OLDENKAMP, ERIC ALAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.