Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sl Birch Street Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Hage, Brian Elliot - Lead Attorney, against Dreifurst, Brock, in the jurisdiction of Lyon County, MN, . Lyon County, MN Superior Courts with Zimmer, Tricia B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2023 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLyon County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Order and Judgment-Eviction Index #15
Date: March 13, 2023Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index #17
Date: April 03, 2023Request for Writ of Recovery Index #12
Date: March 13, 2023Writ of Recovery of Premises Index #16
Date: March 13, 2023Eviction Summons Index #4
Date: February 27, 2023Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #11
Date: March 02, 2023Request for Remote or In-Person Appearance Index #5
Date: February 27, 2023Court Clerk Minutes Index #13
Date: March 13, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #6
Date: February 28, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #14
Date: March 13, 2023Notice of Judicial Determination Index #7
Date: February 28, 2023Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: February 15, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #10
Date: March 02, 2023Affidavit of Plaintiff Index #8
Date: March 02, 2023Affidavit of Not Found Index #9
Date: March 02, 2023Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Zimmer, Tricia B Index #3
Date: February 27, 2023Certificate of Representation Index #2
Date: February 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index #17
Judge: Zimmer, Tricia B |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order and Judgment-Eviction Index #15
Judge: Zimmer, Tricia B |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Recovery Index #12
Judge: Zimmer, Tricia B |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Recovery of Premises Index #16
Judge: Zimmer, Tricia B |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Clerk Minutes Index #13
Judge: Zimmer, Tricia B |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index #14
Judge: Zimmer, Tricia B |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Hybrid
Judge: Zimmer, Tricia B |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fail to Appear at a hearing Filed By: Defendant Dreifurst, Brock
Judge: Zimmer, Tricia B |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #11
Judge: Zimmer, Tricia B |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing Index #10
Judge: Zimmer, Tricia B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.