Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sl 500 Village Dr Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Love, Ralph Andrew Foote - Lead Attorney, against Harden, David, in the jurisdiction of Lyon County, MN, . Lyon County, MN Superior Courts with Zimmer, Tricia B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLyon County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #27
Date: February 08, 2023Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index #28
Date: February 27, 2023Affidavit of Non-Compliance Index #22
Date: January 26, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #23
Date: January 26, 2023Order for Judgment and Judgment Index #25
Date: January 30, 2023Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Zimmer, Tricia B Index #26
Date: January 30, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #24
Date: January 30, 2023Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #13
Date: December 19, 2022Exhibit List Judicial Officer: Zimmer, Tricia B Index #19
Date: January 04, 2023Court Clerk Minutes Index #18
Date: January 04, 2023Order-Other Judicial Officer: Zimmer, Tricia B Index #20
Date: January 05, 2023Correspondence Index #14
Date: December 30, 2022Notice of Judicial Determination Index #16
Date: January 03, 2023Affidavit of Not Found Index #11
Date: December 19, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #17
Date: January 04, 2023Notice of Judicial Determination Index #9
Date: December 14, 2022Affidavit of Plaintiff Index #10
Date: December 19, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #12
Date: December 19, 2022Eviction Summons Index #8
Date: December 14, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #7
Date: December 14, 2022Eviction Summons Index #4
Date: December 14, 2022Request for Continuance Index #5
Date: December 14, 2022Order-Other Index #6
Date: December 14, 2022Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Zimmer, Tricia B Index #3
Date: December 14, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #2
Date: December 09, 2022Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: December 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index #28 | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #27 | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Index #25 | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Zimmer, Tricia B Index #26 | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #24 | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Compliance Index #22 | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #23 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Defendant Harden, David; Attorney LOVE, RALPH ANDREW FOOTE Index #21 | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order-Other Judicial Officer: Zimmer, Tricia B Index #20 | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit List Judicial Officer: Zimmer, Tricia B Index #19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.