Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Lyon County, MN, . Lyon County, MN Superior Courts with Bush, Leland presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2017 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLyon County, MN |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal With Prejudice - Judgment |
Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: January 24, 2018Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: February 07, 2018Stipulation and Proposed Order
Date: January 22, 2018Order-Other
Date: January 16, 2018Order for Dismissal
Date: January 24, 2018Proposed Order or Document
Date: January 11, 2018Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: January 11, 2018Court Clerk Minutes
Date: January 10, 2018Proposed Order or Document
Date: January 04, 2018Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: January 04, 2018Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: December 28, 2017Proposed Order or Document
Date: December 26, 2017Correspondence
Date: December 27, 2017Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: December 26, 2017Confidential Financial Source Documents Form 11.2
Date: December 22, 2017Affidavit-Other
Date: December 22, 2017Proposed Order or Document
Date: December 22, 2017Petition-Other
Date: December 22, 2017Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: December 12, 2017Correspondence
Date: November 03, 2017Notice of Motion and Motion
Date: November 06, 2017Stipulation and Proposed Order
Date: October 11, 2017Order-Other
Date: October 13, 2017Discovery Disclosure
Date: September 29, 2017Correspondence
Date: August 07, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Correspondence for Judicial Approval | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Order for Dismissal | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Proposed Order | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Order-Other | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Correspondence for Judicial Approval | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Correspondence for Judicial Approval |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.