Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aaa Collections Midwest Inc, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Wenzel, Troy Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Lyon County, MN, . Lyon County, MN Superior Courts with Bush, Leland presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLyon County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: March 12, 2021Court Clerk Minutes
Date: March 11, 2021Order for Judgment
Date: March 11, 2021Judgment
Date: March 12, 2021Power of Attorney
Date: January 18, 2021Summons
Date: January 21, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: January 21, 2021Power of Attorney
Date: February 24, 2021Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: December 17, 2020Court Clerk Minutes Index #10
Date: March 11, 2021Judgment Index #8
Date: March 12, 2021Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Bush, Leland Index #7
Date: March 11, 2021Power of Attorney Index #6
Date: February 24, 2021Statement of Claim and Summons Index #1
Date: December 17, 2020Power of Attorney Index #2
Date: January 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #11 | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index # 11 | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #8 | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Plaintiff AAA Collections Midwest Inc; Defendant Wenzel, Troy Joseph Index #9 | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 9 | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 8 | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.