Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Koochiching County, MN, . Koochiching County, MN Superior Courts with Lange, Steven Z. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2020 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKoochiching County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissal Without Prejudice |
Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: July 08, 2020Notice-Other
Date: July 20, 2020Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: September 02, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: September 23, 2020Court Clerk Minutes
Date: September 25, 2020Order for Dismissal
Date: September 25, 2020Notice of Filing of Order
Date: September 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Dismissal
Judge: Lange, Steven Z. |
|
September 25, 2020 | Hearing | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
September 02, 2020 | Hearing | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice-Other | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Pandemic Event | |
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim and Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.