Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Range Credit Bureau Inc, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Carriveau, Darin, in the jurisdiction of Koochiching County, MN, . Koochiching County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2020 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKoochiching County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: February 08, 2021Order for Judgment and Judgment
Date: February 08, 2021Summons
Date: November 24, 2020Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: November 24, 2020Court Clerk Minutes
Date: February 05, 2021Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: November 16, 2020Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #7
Date: February 08, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3
Date: November 24, 2020Statement of Claim and Summons Index #1
Date: November 16, 2020Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Shermoen, Jerrod A Index #6
Date: February 08, 2021Court Clerk Minutes Index #5
Date: February 05, 2021Summons Index #2
Date: November 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #8 | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Judge: Shermoen, Jerrod A |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #7 | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Shermoen, Jerrod A Index #6 | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index #5 | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.