Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Range Credit Bureau Inc., filed a(n) Conciliation case against Boorman, Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Koochiching County, MN, . Koochiching County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2019 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKoochiching County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: April 15, 2019Statement of Claim and Summons Index #1
Date: March 10, 2019Notice of Hearing Index #2
Date: March 14, 2019Power of Attorney Index #4
Date: April 04, 2019Court Clerk Minutes Index #5
Date: April 04, 2019Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: LeDuc, Charles H. Index #7
Date: April 15, 2019Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: LeDuc, Charles H. Index #6
Date: April 10, 2019Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #8
Date: April 15, 2019Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: March 10, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: March 14, 2019Power of Attorney
Date: April 04, 2019Court Clerk Minutes
Date: April 04, 2019Order for Judgment
Date: April 10, 2019Order for Judgment and Judgment
Date: April 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #9 | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: LeDuc, Charles H. Index #7 | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #8 | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Judge: LeDuc, Charles H. |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: LeDuc, Charles H. Index #6 | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment
Judge: LeDuc, Charles H. |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Power of Attorney Index #4 | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index #5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.