Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Steven Takaichi Dds, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Scholler, Robert Alan, in the jurisdiction of Koochiching County, MN, . Koochiching County, MN Superior Courts with LeDuc, Charles H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKoochiching County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Transcript of Judgment Issued
Date: September 11, 2015Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: LeDuc, Charles H. Index #3
Date: July 31, 2015Notice-Other Index #4
Date: August 10, 2015Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #5
Date: September 11, 2015Order for Judgment and Judgment
Date: July 31, 2015Notice-Other
Date: June 25, 2015Notice-Other
Date: August 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #5 | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice-Other Index #4 | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice-Other | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: LeDuc, Charles H. Index #3 | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Judge: LeDuc, Charles H. |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice-Other Filed By: Defendant SCHOLLER, ROBERT ALAN; Plaintiff STEVEN TAKAICHI DDS Index #2 | |
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice-Other | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim and Summons Filed By: Plaintiff STEVEN TAKAICHI DDS Index #1 | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim and Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.