Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Account Hearing filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, MN, . Jackson County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBentz, Darci J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 23, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 78
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reminder Notice Index # 77
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
CARP Account Summary Index # 76
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 75 (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. )
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 74
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 73
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
CAAP Audit Report Index # 72
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Personal Well-Being Report Index # 71
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 70
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.