Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Account Hearing filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, MN, . Jackson County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBentz, Darci J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationJackson County, MN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeConservatorship-Estate |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: July 11, 2022Notice of Deficiency
Date: July 11, 2022Order-Other
Date: October 04, 2021Copy Request
Date: January 26, 2021Annual or Periodic Accounting
Date: January 28, 2022Inventory or Account Review Report
Date: October 04, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: January 08, 2021Notice to New Conservators
Date: January 08, 2021CAAP Audit Report
Date: July 08, 2022Inventory
Date: April 23, 2021Notice to File or Appear - Guardian-Conservator
Date: April 13, 2021Order Granting Conservatorship
Date: January 08, 2021Other Document
Date: January 26, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: January 15, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: December 21, 2020Proposed Order or Document
Date: January 14, 2021Order Appointing Visitor
Date: December 18, 2020Witness List
Date: December 15, 2020Proposed Order or Document
Date: December 15, 2020Letters of Conservatorship
Date: January 08, 2021Acceptance of Appointment and Oath
Date: January 08, 2021Proposed Order or Document
Date: January 08, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: December 18, 2020Notice of Filing of Order
Date: December 18, 2020Order Appointing Attorney
Date: December 17, 2020Petition for Conservatorship
Date: December 11, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: July 11, 2022Order Granting Conservatorship
Date: January 15, 2021Reminder Notice
Date: September 02, 2022Reminder Notice
Date: August 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 60 (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. )
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 59 (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. )
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Annual or Periodic Accounting Index # 58
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
CARP Account Summary Index # 57
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Inventory or Account Review Report Index # 56
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Annual Account Index # 55
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deficiency Index # 54
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Inventory or Account Review Report Index # 53
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Annual Account Index # 52
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.