Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Guardianship-Person filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, MN, . Jackson County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBentz, Darci J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 59 (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. )
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
January 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Personal Well-Being Report Index # 58
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
January 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 57
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice to File or Appear - Guardian-Conservator Index # 56
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice to File or Appear - Guardian-Conservator Index # 55
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice to File or Appear - Guardian-Conservator Index # 54
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice to File or Appear - Guardian-Conservator Index # 53
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 52
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 51
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 50
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.