Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill case in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, MN, . Jackson County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBentz, Darci J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2016 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeTermination Of Jurisdiction |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Proceeding and Discharging Patient | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | 6-Month Report | |
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | 60-90 Day Commitment Report | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | 60-90 Day Commitment Report | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | 6-Month Report | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Order of Stayed Commitment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.