Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, MN, . Jackson County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBentz, Darci J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2015 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeLetters Issued - Unsupervised Formal |
Petition to Allow Final Acctg., Settle and Distribute Estate
Date: June 13, 2017Copy Request
Date: June 20, 2017Proposed Order or Document
Date: June 13, 2017Notice-Other
Date: June 13, 2017Waiver
Date: June 13, 2017Affidavit of Service
Date: June 16, 2016Notice of Filing of Order
Date: June 15, 2017Order for Frml Probate of Will-Appointment of Pers Rep-Unsup
Date: March 09, 2015Order Allowing Final Account
Date: June 15, 2017Consent to Final Acct-Issuance of Decree-Order of Distrib
Date: June 13, 2017Proposal for Distribution
Date: June 13, 2017Final Accounting
Date: June 13, 2017Inventory
Date: June 16, 2016Order and Notice of Hearing
Date: February 06, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Copy Request | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Allowing Final Account | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition to Allow Final Acctg., Settle and Distribute Estate | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice-Other | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Consent to Final Acct-Issuance of Decree-Order of Distrib | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Proposal for Distribution | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Accounting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.