Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hearing filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, MN, . Jackson County, MN Superior Courts with Nelson, Jan Craig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNelson, Jan Craig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2021 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJackson County, MN |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 32
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Schedule Hearing (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. )
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 31
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Index # 30
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Index # 29
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 28
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Paternity Index # 27
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Paternity Determination - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Nelson, Jan Craig)
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.