Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Notice Of Case Filing And Assignment Index # 7 filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, MN, . Jackson County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBentz, Darci J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 21
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Schedule Hearing
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 19
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Custody Index # 18 (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. )
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 16 (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. )
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Index # 15
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Using Remote Technology
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 14
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Order Index # 13 (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. )
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Using Remote Technology
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.