Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, MN, . Jackson County, MN Superior Courts with Nelson, Jan Craig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNelson, Jan Craig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 03, 2017 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJackson County, MN |
Matter TypePaternity |
Case Outcome TypeSupport Order |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: January 10, 2019Order for Child Support
Date: November 08, 2017Order for Child Support
Date: January 08, 2019Notice of Filing of Order
Date: November 08, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Child Support
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Default | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Child Support Order
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Supporting Affidavit of Child Support Officer | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Modification of Child Support | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Expedited Process | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Order for Child Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.