Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, MN, . Jackson County, MN Superior Courts with Nelson, Jan Craig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNelson, Jan Craig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 19, 2015 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJackson County, MN |
Matter TypePaternity |
Case Outcome TypeSupport Order |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: January 26, 2021Order for Child Support
Date: January 25, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: March 20, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Child Support
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Default | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document
Judge: Nelson, Jan Craig |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Expedited Process | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Modification of Child Support | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Supporting Affidavit of Child Support Officer | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.