Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Of Minnesota, Runge, Andrew James Runge, Andrew J., County Of Jackson, filed a(n) Support case against Ripka, Kayla J., in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, MN, . Jackson County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBentz, Darci Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 09, 2014 |
CategorySupport |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Schedule Hearing
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held In-Person
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judicial Determination Index # 46
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Remote or In-Person Appearance Index # 45
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 44
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certify Personal Service Index # 43
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 42
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Index # 41 (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. )
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 39
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Schedule Hearing (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. )
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.