Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Motion Hearing filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, MN, . Jackson County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBentz, Darci J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2022 |
CategoryConsumer Credit Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationJackson County, MN |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Notice of Case Filing and Assignment
Date: June 30, 2022Certificate of Representation
Date: June 29, 2022Summons and Complaint
Date: June 29, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: July 19, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 29, 2022Affidavit of Service
Date: June 29, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: July 07, 2022Discovery Plan
Date: June 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 18
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judicial Determination Index # 17
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Schedule Hearing
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Continuance Index # 16
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 15
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 14 (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. )
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Non-Military Status Index # 13
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of No Answer, ID, Non-Military Status and Amt Due Index # 12
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Index # 11
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Attorney Index # 10
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.