Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, MN, . Jackson County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBentz, Darci J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2017 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: November 03, 2017Order for Judgment and Judgment
Date: November 03, 2017Answer
Date: September 15, 2017Counterclaim
Date: September 15, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: July 10, 2017Correspondence
Date: July 10, 2017Answer
Date: July 07, 2017Order for Continuance
Date: July 10, 2017Proposed Order or Document
Date: July 07, 2017Affidavit of Service
Date: June 05, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: May 12, 2017Correspondence
Date: May 12, 2017Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: May 12, 2017Affidavit of Service
Date: September 15, 2017Motion
Date: July 07, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer | |
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Counterclaim | |
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
July 10, 2017 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.