Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Correspondence Index # 12 filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts with Flanagan, Patrick W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFlanagan, Patrick W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Flanagan, Patrick W. |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 15
Judge: Flanagan, Patrick W. |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 14
Judge: Flanagan, Patrick W. |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judicial Determination Index # 13 (Judicial Officer: Flanagan, Patrick W. )
Judge: Flanagan, Patrick W. |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Index # 12 (Judicial Officer: Flanagan, Patrick W. )
Judge: Flanagan, Patrick W. |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form 11.2 Attachments Index # 11
Judge: Flanagan, Patrick W. |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 10
Judge: Flanagan, Patrick W. |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Representation Index # 9
Judge: Flanagan, Patrick W. |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer and Counterpetition Index # 8
Judge: Flanagan, Patrick W. |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 7
Judge: Flanagan, Patrick W. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.