Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Larsen-Mccorry, Christine Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mccorry, Richard P, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 1996 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 1997 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
May 12, 1997 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 10, 1997 | Docket Event | Economics Hearing | |
August 23, 1996 | Docket Event | Economics Hearing | |
July 12, 1996 | Docket Event | Economics Hearing | |
April 30, 1996 | Docket Event | Economics Hearing | |
April 03, 1996 | Docket Event | Economics Hearing | |
March 12, 1996 | Docket Event | Economics Hearing | |
January 16, 1996 | Docket Event | Economics Hearing | |
November 14, 1995 | Docket Event | Economics Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.