Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Staloch, John, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Brown, Lauren, in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts with Chantry, Amy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChantry, Amy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 03, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren Index #26
Date: February 08, 2023Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren Index #24
Date: February 08, 2023Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren Index #25
Date: February 08, 2023Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren Index #27
Date: February 08, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #23
Date: December 16, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren; Plaintiff Staloch, John Index #18
Date: November 08, 2022Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren Index #20
Date: November 08, 2022Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Brosnahan, Amy R. Index #22
Date: December 16, 2022Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren Index #21
Date: November 07, 2022Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Klossner, John D. Index #13
Date: November 02, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #14
Date: November 02, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #16
Date: November 03, 2022Answer Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren Index #10
Date: October 27, 2022Order Vacating Judgment Judicial Officer: Chantry, Amy Index #17
Date: November 03, 2022Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Klossner, John D. Index #7
Date: October 31, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #3
Date: October 14, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #11
Date: October 27, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #4
Date: October 19, 2022Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Birnbaum, Robert Index #5
Date: October 19, 2022Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren Index #19
Date: October 14, 2022Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: October 04, 2022Eviction Summons Index #2
Date: October 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren Index #26 | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren Index #24 | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren Index #25 | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren Index #27 | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #23 | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Brosnahan, Amy R. Index #22 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren; Plaintiff Staloch, John | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Chantry, Amy | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Defendant Brown, Lauren; Plaintiff Staloch, John Index #18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.