Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hearing filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts with Amy R. Brosnahan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmy R. Brosnahan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryChange Of Name |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing by Publication Index # 20 | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 19 | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 18 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 17 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 16 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing by Publication Index # 15 | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 14 | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.