Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts with Klossner, John D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2019 |
CategoryForfeiture |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Proposed Order or Document
Date: June 25, 2019Notice of Filing of Order
Date: July 02, 2019Order for Dismissal
Date: July 02, 2019Motion
Date: June 25, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: June 19, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Filing of Order
Date: March 07, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: March 08, 2019Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order
Date: March 06, 2019Proposed Order or Document
Date: March 06, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: March 04, 2019Complaint-Civil
Date: March 04, 2019Affidavit of Service
Date: March 05, 2019Summons
Date: March 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Dismissal
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion | |
June 19, 2019 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
March 29, 2019 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
March 08, 2019 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order
Judge: Brosnahan, Amy R. |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.