Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Credit Corp Solutions, Inc., filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Arnal, Corbin Cribbs - Lead Attorney, against Dilorenzo, Seth, in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
|
Judgment Index #6
Date: January 17, 2023Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Lancaster, Peter Index #5
Date: January 15, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #4
Date: January 08, 2023Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #8
Date: March 08, 2023Summons and Notice Filed By: Plaintiff Credit Corp Solutions, Inc. Index #3
Date: December 06, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #2
Date: November 17, 2022Statement of Claim Index #1
Date: November 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #8 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Plaintiff Credit Corp Solutions, Inc.; Defendant Dilorenzo, Seth Index #7 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #6 | |
January 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Lancaster, Peter Index #5 | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Lancaster, Peter | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Due [R] (Judicial Officer: Lancaster, Peter )
Judge: Lancaster, Peter |
|
January 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #4 | |
January 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 4 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons and Notice Filed By: Plaintiff Credit Corp Solutions, Inc. Index #3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.