Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Conciliation Hearing filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts with Amy J. Chantry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmy J. Chantry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Due [R] (Judicial Officer: Chantry, Amy )
Judge: Chantry, Amy |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 7 | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 8 | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons and Notice Index # 6 | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Continuance Index # 5 | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index # 3 | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Index # 4 | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim Index # 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.