Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fairview Health Services, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Sandy, Christina Rae - Lead Attorney, against Husbyn, Mildred H, in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts with Klossner, John presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2019 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: January 21, 2020Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: April 24, 2020Judgment and Notice of Judgment
Date: January 21, 2020Order for Judgment
Date: January 16, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: December 10, 2019Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: December 03, 2019Notice of Hearing Index #2
Date: December 10, 2019Statement of Claim and Summons Index #1
Date: December 03, 2019Satisfaction of Judgment Index #7
Date: April 24, 2020Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #6
Date: January 21, 2020Judgment and Notice of Judgment Index #5
Date: January 21, 2020Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Klossner, John D. Index #4
Date: January 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Index #7 | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment and Notice of Judgment | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #6 | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment and Notice of Judgment Index #5 | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Klossner, John D. Index #4 | |
December 10, 2019 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index #2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.