Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hawks, Cory, filed a(n) Decree Of Descent case in the jurisdiction of Hubbard County, MN, . Hubbard County, MN Superior Courts with Tiffany, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2022 |
CategoryDecree Of Descent |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHubbard County, MN |
|
Proposed Order or Document
Date: August 11, 2022Affidavit of Service of Notice to the Comm of Human Services
Date: July 20, 2022Affidavit of Publication
Date: August 02, 2022Medical Assistance Clearance
Date: August 03, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: July 20, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: July 07, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: July 07, 2022Order and Notice of Hearing
Date: July 07, 2022Petition for Determination of Descent
Date: June 30, 2022Proposed Order or Document
Date: June 30, 2022Medical Assistance Clearance
Date: July 21, 2022Proposed Order or Document Filed By: Attorney LARSON, GREGORY D Index #13
Date: August 11, 2022Decree of Descent Judicial Officer: Tiffany, Robert D. Index #14
Date: August 15, 2022Medical Assistance Clearance Index #11
Date: August 03, 2022Medical Assistance Clearance Filed By: Attorney LARSON, GREGORY D Index #9
Date: July 21, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #15
Date: August 25, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #6
Date: July 20, 2022Affidavit of Publication Index #10
Date: August 02, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #5
Date: July 07, 2022Order and Notice of Hearing Judicial Officer: Schieferdecker, Eric P. Index #3
Date: July 07, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #4
Date: July 07, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #2
Date: June 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #15 | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Decree of Descent Judicial Officer: Tiffany, Robert D. Index #14 | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Filed By: Attorney LARSON, GREGORY D Index #13 | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Submissions-Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #12 | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Submissions-Under Advisement | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Medical Assistance Clearance | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Medical Assistance Clearance Index #11 | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.