Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
2 Patriots Properties, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Enger, Matthew Lee - Lead Attorney, against Durran, Pete, Mendez, Theresa, in the jurisdiction of Hubbard County, MN, . Hubbard County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHubbard County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Judgment Index #11
Date: December 13, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #5
Date: November 23, 2022Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Smith, John P Index #10
Date: December 09, 2022Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Schieferdecker, Eric P. Index #13
Date: December 14, 2022Request for Writ of Recovery Index #8
Date: December 07, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #12
Date: December 13, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #6
Date: November 29, 2022Other Document Index #3
Date: November 18, 2022Eviction Summons Index #4
Date: November 23, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #2
Date: November 18, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #9
Date: December 07, 2022Complaint-Civil Filed By: Attorney ENGER, MATTHEW LEE Index #1
Date: November 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Schieferdecker, Eric P. Index #13 | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #11 | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #12 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Smith, John P Index #10 | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Writ of Recovery Index #8 | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #9 | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Submissions-Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #7 | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #6 | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.