Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hicks, William C - Lead Attorney, against Westly, Debra, in the jurisdiction of Hubbard County, MN, . Hubbard County, MN Superior Courts with Tiffany, Robert D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTiffany, Robert D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2022 |
CategoryConsumer Credit Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHubbard County, MN |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #16
Date: January 19, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #14
Date: January 13, 2023Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #18
Date: February 07, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment Index #17
Date: January 19, 2023Certificate of Representation Index #3
Date: November 04, 2022Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #21
Date: September 06, 2023Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #19
Date: February 22, 2023Affidavit-Other Index #10
Date: January 13, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #13
Date: January 13, 2023Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #20
Date: May 29, 2023Memorandum Index #11
Date: January 13, 2023Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Schieferdecker, Eric P. Index #15
Date: January 19, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #7
Date: December 08, 2022Notice of Case Filing Index #6
Date: November 07, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion Index #9
Date: January 13, 2023Discovery Plan Index #5
Date: November 04, 2022Affidavit-Other Index #12
Date: January 13, 2023Civil Cover Sheet Index #4
Date: November 04, 2022Summons and Complaint Index #1
Date: November 04, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #2
Date: November 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #21 | |
May 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #20 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #19 | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #18 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #16 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Index #17 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Schieferdecker, Eric P. Index #15 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Processed Judgment Entry | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #14 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit-Other Index #10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.