Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sanchez Rojas, Candido, Vazquez Campuzano, Leydi, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN, . Hennepin County, MN Superior Courts with Knight, Holly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHennepin County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Order-Other Judicial Officer: Knight, Holly Index #8
Date: March 16, 2023Notice of Case Assignment Judicial Officer: Knight, Holly Index #5
Date: February 17, 2023Notice of Hearing Index #7
Date: February 21, 2023Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Knight, Holly Index #10
Date: April 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Knight, Holly Index #10 | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Petitioner Vazquez Campuzano, Leydi Index #9 | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Suspended - Hennepin County Judicial Officer: Knight, Holly | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Order-Other Judicial Officer: Knight, Holly Index #8 | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index #7 | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Interpreter Filed By: Petitioner SANCHEZ ROJAS, CANDIDO; Petitioner Vazquez Campuzano, Leydi Index #6 | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 7
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Interpreter Index # 6
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment Judicial Officer: Knight, Holly Index #5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.