Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Icmc Order For Mediation Index # 8 filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN, . Hennepin County, MN Superior Courts with Holly B. Knight presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHennepin County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Attendance-class Index # 13
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Attendance-class Index # 12
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Recognition of Parentage Index # 11
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer and Counterpetition Index # 10
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Representation Index # 9
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
ICMC Order for Mediation Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Knight, Holly )
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 7
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment Index # 6 (Judicial Officer: Knight, Holly )
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form 11.1 personal information Index # 5
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Representation Index # 4
Judge: Knight, Holly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.