Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Exparte Order Index # 9 filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN, . Hennepin County, MN Superior Courts with Knight, Holly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2023 |
CategoryLegal Separation |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHennepin County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Respondent Index # 15
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Responsive Motion Index # 14
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Counsel Index # 13
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit-Other Index # 12
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Representation Index # 11
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 10
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Knight, Holly )
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
ExParte Order Index # 9 (Judicial Officer: Knight, Holly )
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 7 (Judicial Officer: Knight, Holly )
Judge: Knight, Holly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.