Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Icmc Order - Opted Out Of Early Neutral Evaluation Index # 7 filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN, . Hennepin County, MN Superior Courts with Knight, Holly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHennepin County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ICMC Order - Opted Out of Early Neutral Evaluation Index # 7 (Judicial Officer: Knight, Holly )
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 6
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Interpreter Index # 5
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
February 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Index # 4
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
February 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Admission of Service Index # 3
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment Index # 2 (Judicial Officer: Knight, Holly )
Judge: Knight, Holly |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Index # 1
Judge: Knight, Holly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.