Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN, . Hennepin County, MN Superior Courts with Reding, Jeannice M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHennepin County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDissolution Granted - Judgment |
Judgment
Date: February 06, 2015Pre-Trial Order-Dissolution
Date: August 06, 2014ICMC Order - Opted Out of Early Neutral Evaluation
Date: April 16, 2014Order for Trial
Date: November 05, 2014Notice of Case Reassignment
Date: March 28, 2014Notice of Case Assignment
Date: March 20, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Confidential Information Form 11.2 Attachments | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Processed Judgment Entry | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fnd of Fact-Conclusions of Law-Order for Judg and Decree
Judge: Reding, Jeannice M. |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Confidential Information Form 11.2 Attachments | |
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.