Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Support case in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN, . Hennepin County, MN Superior Courts with Benson, Bev presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2011 |
CategorySupport |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationHennepin County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeSupport Order |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: January 13, 2017Order Granting In Forma Pauperis
Date: November 02, 2016Order for Child Support
Date: January 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Order for Child Support | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Williams, Susan |
|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Department of Employment and Economic Development | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Granting In Forma Pauperis
Judge: Benson, Bev |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Confidential Financial Source Documents Form 11.2 | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Confidential Information Form 11.2 Attachments | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Proceeding In Forma Pauperis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.