Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dc Nicollet Development Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Love, Ralph Andrew Foote - Lead Attorney, against Murdock, Quentin, Ruhnau, Danielle Marie, in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN, . Hennepin County, MN Superior Courts with Nguyen, Ngoc presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2023 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHennepin County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Notice-Other Index #2
Date: January 19, 2023Eviction Summons Index #3
Date: February 08, 2023Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Nguyen, Ngoc Index #12
Date: May 16, 2023Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Nguyen, Ngoc Index #13
Date: May 16, 2023Affidavit of Not Found Index #5
Date: February 13, 2023Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order Judicial Officer: Nguyen, Ngoc Index #9
Date: February 22, 2023Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #7
Date: February 14, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #6
Date: February 13, 2023Affidavit of Plaintiff Index #4
Date: February 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Nguyen, Ngoc Index #12 | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Nguyen, Ngoc Index #13 | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Compliance Filed By: Plaintiff DC NICOLLET DEVELOPMENT LLC Index #11 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order Judicial Officer: Nguyen, Ngoc Index #9 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held In-Person | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Agreement Judicial Officer: Nguyen, Ngoc Index #10 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Remote or In-Person Appearance Judicial Officer: Nguyen, Ngoc Index #8 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreement Index # 10 (Judicial Officer: Nguyen, Ngoc )
Judge: Nguyen, Ngoc |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order Index # 9 (Judicial Officer: Nguyen, Ngoc )
Judge: Nguyen, Ngoc |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Remote or In-Person Appearance Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Nguyen, Ngoc )
Judge: Nguyen, Ngoc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.