Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN, . Hennepin County, MN Superior Courts with Moreno, Daniel C. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoreno, Daniel C. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 02, 2017 |
CategoryChange Of Name |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHennepin County, MN |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Outcome TypeChange Of Name Granted |
Application for Name Change
Date: October 02, 2017Order Granting Name Change
Date: November 20, 2017Consent to Criminal Background Check
Date: October 02, 2017Proposed Order or Document
Date: October 02, 2017Correspondence
Date: October 06, 2017Other Document
Date: October 02, 2017Notice of Case Assignment
Date: October 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Copy Request | |
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Granting Name Change | |
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Name Change Sent to Secretary of State | |
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment | |
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Application for Name Change | |
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Consent to Criminal Background Check | |
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Other Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.