Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lacey, Brian, Lacey, Debbie, Stoeser, Kathleen, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Grant County, MN, . Grant County, MN Superior Courts with Churchwell, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGrant County, MN |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Proposed Order or Document Index #55
Date: January 05, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #43
Date: June 20, 2022Certificate of Representation Filed By: Attorney ANDERSON, JUSTIN ROBERT Index #60
Date: January 05, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion Filed By: Attorney SEEGER, NATHAN LEE Index #38
Date: May 17, 2022Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index #49
Date: July 08, 2022Affidavit of Attorney Filed By: Attorney SEEGER, NATHAN LEE Index #39
Date: May 17, 2022Affidavit of Publication Index #66
Date: February 07, 2023Request for Hearing Index #34
Date: May 17, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #41
Date: May 19, 2022Order and Notice of Hearing Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #35
Date: May 17, 2022Order Formal Probate of Will Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #68
Date: February 15, 2023Order and Notice of Hearing Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #61
Date: January 06, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #65
Date: January 06, 2023Nomination of Personal Representative Index #58
Date: January 05, 2023Will - Electronic Version Index #10
Date: October 05, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #4
Date: October 01, 2021Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index #6
Date: October 01, 2021Affidavit of Mailing Index #6
Date: October 01, 2021Certificate of Representation Index #8
Date: October 05, 2021Letters Testamentary Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #67
Date: February 15, 2023ExParte Order Judicial Officer: Churchwell, Timothy M. Index #16
Date: October 04, 2021Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index #9
Date: October 05, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #3
Date: October 01, 2021Order-Other Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #52
Date: October 10, 2022Order-Change of Venue Index #1
Date: October 22, 2021Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #4
Date: October 01, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #12
Date: October 06, 2021Order-Other Judicial Officer: Churchwell, Timothy M. Index #20
Date: October 22, 2021Affidavit of Mailing Index #14
Date: October 06, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #56
Date: January 05, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #54
Date: January 05, 2023Affidavit of Publication Index #46
Date: June 29, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #50
Date: July 11, 2022Memorandum Filed By: Attorney SEEGER, NATHAN LEE Index #26
Date: May 17, 2022Affidavit-Other Filed By: Name Not Available Online Index #27
Date: May 17, 2022Memorandum Filed By: Attorney SEEGER, NATHAN LEE Index #47
Date: July 01, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #48
Date: July 06, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #40
Date: May 19, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #42
Date: May 19, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #33
Date: May 17, 2022Cover Sheet for Non Public Documents Form 11.2 Index #24
Date: May 17, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #32
Date: May 17, 2022Petition for Formal Appointment of Special Administrator Index #1
Date: October 01, 2021Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney SEEGER, NATHAN LEE Index #21
Date: October 22, 2021Affidavit-Other Index #11
Date: October 06, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney SEEGER, NATHAN LEE Index #19
Date: October 14, 2021Objection Index #11
Date: October 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Claims Due | |
April 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Disallowance or Partial Allowance of Claim Filed By: Attorney ANDERSON, JUSTIN ROBERT; Personal Representative Lu, Melissa; Name Not Available Online Index #70 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney ANDERSON, JUSTIN ROBERT; Attorney OLSON, KENDRA ELIZABETH; Attorney SEEGER, NATHAN LEE Index #69 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Formal Probate of Will Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #68 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #67 | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication Index #66 | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication Index # 66 | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Hearing Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #61 | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #65 | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney ANDERSON, JUSTIN ROBERT; Attorney OLSON, KENDRA ELIZABETH; Attorney SEEGER, NATHAN LEE Index #63 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.